WA SB6357 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the dollar limit of pull-tabs.
Title
Increasing the dollar limit of pull-tabs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 70, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-20 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2492 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.