WA SB6338 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Giving preferences to housing trust fund projects that involve collaboration between local school districts and housing authorities to help children of low-income families succeed in school.
Title
Giving preferences to housing trust fund projects that involve collaboration between local school districts and housing authorities to help children of low-income families succeed in school.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-28 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | House | CB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2014-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-26 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Public hearing, executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | FIHI - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2462 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.