WA SB6298 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding domestic violence harassment to the list of offenses for which a person is prohibited from possessing a firearm.
Title
Adding domestic violence harassment to the list of offenses for which a person is prohibited from possessing a firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 234, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 39; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |