WA SB6281 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing specified offenders to earn positive achievement time on community custody.
Title
Allowing specified offenders to earn positive achievement time on community custody.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 5:45 PM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |