WA SB6278 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of seed certification fees.
Title
Concerning the use of seed certification fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 233, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |