WA SB6270 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the resolution of warrants by persons serving a term of confinement in prison or juvenile rehabilitation.
Title
Concerning the resolution of warrants by persons serving a term of confinement in prison or juvenile rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |