WA SB6268 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the orca protection act.
Title
Creating the orca protection act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-14 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |