WA SB6257 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing sexually explicit performance. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Addressing a sexually explicit act. )
Title
Addressing sexually explicit performance. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Addressing a sexually explicit act. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-29 | Chapter 144, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-08 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-03-08 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-03-08 | President signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-03-06 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2012-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-21 | PSEP - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2012-02-21 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-02-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-10 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2012-02-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-02-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-08 | Floor amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-02 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-16 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |