WA SB6241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the January 1, 2020, implementation of the school employees' benefits board program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the January 1, 2020, implementation of the school employees' benefits board program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Final Passage without House amendments (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateEffective date 6/7/2018*.
2018-03-23SenateChapter 260, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-23SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-07HousePassed final passage; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-07HouseHouse receded from amendments.
2018-03-06SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2018-03-06SenateAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2018-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-02HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM.
2018-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-14SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-14SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-14Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-31SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

HB2438 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6241&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6241.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6241-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6241-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6241-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6241-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6241&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-14-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6241&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-02-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6241&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2018

Bill Comments

feedback