WA SB6239 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing local governments to adopt a property tax exemption program for the preservation of certain affordable housing.
Title
Authorizing local governments to adopt a property tax exemption program for the preservation of certain affordable housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2016-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-25 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2016-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2544 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.