WA SB6230 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the collective bargaining rights of the professional personnel of port districts.
Title
Concerning the collective bargaining rights of the professional personnel of port districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 251, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-20 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |