WA SB6213 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vehicles at railroad grade crossings.
Title
Concerning vehicles at railroad grade crossings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Chapter 15, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-18 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-20 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2441 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.