WA SB6208 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 10/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing mobility through the modification of stop sign requirements for bicyclists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing mobility through the modification of stop sign requirements for bicyclists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateEffective date 10/1/2020.
2020-03-18SenateChapter 66, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-18SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-05HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-03HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02HouseTR - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:00 AM.
2020-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2020-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-03SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-01-10SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2358 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6208&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6208.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6208-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6208-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6208-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121000&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6208&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121000&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6208&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback