WA SB6180 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Consolidating designated forest lands and open space timber lands for ease of administration.
Title
Consolidating designated forest lands and open space timber lands for ease of administration.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 137, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2014-02-26 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |