WA SB6179 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing workers' compensation group self-insurance plans.
Title
Authorizing workers' compensation group self-insurance plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Executive session in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |