WA SB6169 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the ocean policy advisory council.
Title
Establishing the ocean policy advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-02-16 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-02-14 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-14 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-03 | ENRM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-13 | First reading, referred to Energy, Natural Resources & Marine Waters. |