WA SB6165 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning short-barreled rifles.
Title
Concerning short-barreled rifles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 214, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2481 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.