WA SB6162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Defining dyslexia as a specific learning disability and requiring early screening for dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defining dyslexia as a specific learning disability and requiring early screening for dyslexia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-15SenateChapter 75, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-15SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01HouseFloor amendment
2018-03-01HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-22HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Education
2018-02-14SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-14SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-14SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-14Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-29SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-25SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-25SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-23SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB2796 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-16 - First reading, referred to Education

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6162&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6162.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6162-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6162-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6162-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6162-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6162-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6162&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-14-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6162&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6162&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2018

Bill Comments

feedback