WA SB6123 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting classified school employee salaries.
Title
Adjusting classified school employee salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |