WA SB6122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting temporary workers.
Title
Protecting temporary workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |