WA SB6118 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the membership of the Interstate 5 Columbia river bridge project joint legislative action committee.
Title
Concerning the membership of the Interstate 5 Columbia river bridge project joint legislative action committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6118&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6118.pdf |