WA SB6118 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning lodging taxes for, and certain transfers from, the state convention and trade center account.
Title
Concerning lodging taxes for, and certain transfers from, the state convention and trade center account.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6118&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6118.pdf |