WA SB6113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning priority processing for adult family home license applications.
Title
Concerning priority processing for adult family home license applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Chapter 160, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2346 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.