WA SB6091 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the definition of slayer.
Title
Changing the definition of slayer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 211, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 3; excused, 0. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |