WA SB6053 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a pilot program to provide access to personal hygiene and cleaning products.
Title
Establishing a pilot program to provide access to personal hygiene and cleaning products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-03-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-26 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-18 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6053&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6053.pdf |