WA SB6047 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting retaliation against school district employees that report noncompliance with individualized education programs.
Title
Prohibiting retaliation against school district employees that report noncompliance with individualized education programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |