WA SB6041 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding fish and wildlife law enforcement.
Title
Regarding fish and wildlife law enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 48, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted as amended. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | House | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2460 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-05 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.