WA SB6037 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the uniform parentage act.
Title
Concerning the uniform parentage act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2019. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Chapter 6, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |