WA SB6002 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the Washington voting rights act of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the Washington voting rights act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-19SenateChapter 113, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-19SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-05SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-27HouseCommittee amendment
2018-02-27HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-27HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2018-02-21HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-15HouseSEIT - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology
2018-01-19SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-01-18SenateThird reading.
2018-01-17SenateHeld on second reading.
2018-01-17SenateFloor amendment
2018-01-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-01-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-15SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-12SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6002&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6002.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6002-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6002-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6002-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6002-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6002&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-19-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6002&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-27-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6002&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2018

Bill Comments

feedback