WA SB6000 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a property tax exemption for property held under lease, sublease, or lease-purchase by a nonprofit organization that provides job training, placement, or preemployment services.
Title
Providing a property tax exemption for property held under lease, sublease, or lease-purchase by a nonprofit organization that provides job training, placement, or preemployment services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM failed. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2193 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - First reading, referred to Finance
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6000&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6000.pdf |