WA SB5994 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning penalties relating to antitrust actions.
Title
Concerning penalties relating to antitrust actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2072 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5994&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5994.pdf |