WA SB5970 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing a veteran's preference for the purpose of public employment.
Title
Addressing a veteran's preference for the purpose of public employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Harry Morton [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-01-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-01-26 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-02 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. |