WA SB5957 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the healthy Washington program to provide comprehensive universal single-payer health care coverage for all residents of the state.
Title
Establishing the healthy Washington program to provide comprehensive universal single-payer health care coverage for all residents of the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5957&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5957.pdf |