WA SB5956 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning short-barreled rifles.
Title
Concerning short-barreled rifles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 201, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |