WA SB5933 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the owner of a self-service storage facility to offer self-service storage insurance.
Title
Allowing the owner of a self-service storage facility to offer self-service storage insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-25 | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |