WA SB5924 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning access to personnel records.
Title
Concerning access to personnel records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | LC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 12 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 12 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |