WA SB5920 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning parenting plans.
Title
Concerning parenting plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |