WA SB5912 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing public funding for supreme court campaigns.
Title
Providing public funding for supreme court campaigns.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. James Kastama [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] |
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Eric Oemig [D] |
Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-06 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |