WA SB5907 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for recreational licensing of eulachon, crawfish, and carp.
Title
Providing for recreational licensing of eulachon, crawfish, and carp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |