WA SB5907 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing the policy recommendations resulting from the national institute of corrections review of prison safety.
Title
Implementing the policy recommendations resulting from the national institute of corrections review of prison safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Chapter 252, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-20 | President signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on second reading. | |
2011-04-15 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-04-15 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-04-15 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-04-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-04-12 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-09 | Floor amendment | |
2011-04-09 | 2nd substitute bill not substituted. | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-04-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-04-01 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-04-01 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-04-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-30 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-03-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-25 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2011-03-25 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-03-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:00 PM. | |
2011-03-24 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2036 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.