WA SB5905 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing state employee eligibility for insurance benefits consistent with the employer shared responsibility provisions of the patient protection and affordable care act.
Title
Establishing state employee eligibility for insurance benefits consistent with the employer shared responsibility provisions of the patient protection and affordable care act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-04-22 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 6:00 PM. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |