WA SB5904 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-10 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining independent contractor for purposes of prevailing wage.
Title
Defining independent contractor for purposes of prevailing wage.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosa Franklin [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Margarita Prentice [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-10 | Chapter 63, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-10 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-03 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-03 | President signed. | |
2009-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-20 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-20 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2009-03-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2009-03-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-07 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-23 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-06 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1786 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.