WA SB5900 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-11 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-11 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning construction crane safety.
Title
Concerning construction crane safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2023-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2022 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Effective date 1/1/2025.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70b | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 17 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 17 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 17 | 440 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |