WA SB5882 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ordering an evaluation of recommendations made by the racial disproportionality advisory committee.
Title
Ordering an evaluation of recommendations made by the racial disproportionality advisory committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Debbie Regala [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-24 | Chapter 213, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-24 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-15 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-14 | President signed. | |
2009-04-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | APPH - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-03 | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations. | |
2009-03-20 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-20 | ELCS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-20 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-05 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |