WA SB5873 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing adequate and predictable student transportation.
Title
Providing adequate and predictable student transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Yasmin Trudeau [D] |
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 160 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 160 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 192 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 193 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 225 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |