WA SB5873 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning community forests.
Title
Concerning community forests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1946 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Referred to Capital Budget.