WA SB5841 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying certain vaccine provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying certain vaccine provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback