WA SB5827 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding an additional superior court judge in Whatcom county.
Title
Adding an additional superior court judge in Whatcom county.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1992 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-15 - Effective date 6/6/2024.