WA SB5801 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding basic education allocations for tribal schools.
Title
Regarding basic education allocations for tribal schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-24 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-24 | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1890 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.