WA SB5799 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the expiration date from the sales and use tax exemptions for certain products that impart flavor to food.
Title
Removing the expiration date from the sales and use tax exemptions for certain products that impart flavor to food.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2089 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.